ND SCR4018 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study state agency facility needs including a review of options to construct state-owned facilities to meet those needs.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study state agency facility needs including a review of options to construct state-owned facilities to meet those needs.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] |
Rep. Jerome Kelsh [D] | Rep. Naomi Muscha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 17 nays 75 |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba4018.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-3077-01000.pdf |