ND SCR4017 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging the Indian Affairs Commission to study the archaeological discipline, cultural resources, and the knowledge and expertise of tribal elders and tribal historic preservation officers to educate local, state, and federal agencies and the public and to facilitate effective consultation and cooperation for historic and prehistoric site identification and the betterment of North Dakota and its citizens.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging the Indian Affairs Commission to study the archaeological discipline, cultural resources, and the knowledge and expertise of tribal elders and tribal historic preservation officers to educate local, state, and federal agencies and the public and to facilitate effective consultation and cooperation for historic and prehistoric site identification and the betterment of North Dakota and its citizens.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
Rep. Ruth Buffalo [D] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading, adopted (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, adopted yeas 27 nays 18 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |