ND SCR4017 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution relating to the Obama Administration's proposal that the Senate of the United States consider adoption of a United Nations Arms Trade Treaty.
Title
A concurrent resolution relating to the Obama Administration's proposal that the Senate of the United States consider adoption of a United Nations Arms Trade Treaty.
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] |
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 68 nays 25 |
2013-04-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |