ND SCR4010 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the adequacy of governmental services, including judicial services, to respond to issues relating to an aging population, including veterans, and to study the efficacy of statutes governing public administrator services and methods for the timely and effective delivery of guardianship and public administrator responsibilities and services.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the adequacy of governmental services, including judicial services, to respond to issues relating to an aging population, including veterans, and to study the efficacy of statutes governing public administrator services and methods for the timely and effective delivery of guardianship and public administrator responsibilities and services.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-01 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-04-01 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 11 0 2 | |
2011-03-17 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-04 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-03 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-02-01 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |