ND SCR4008 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Nathe A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President to adopt a veterans remembered flag.
Title
Introduced by Rep. L. Meier, Nathe A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the President to adopt a veterans remembered flag.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Report back amend, do pass, place on consent cal y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-26 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4008.html |