ND SB2439 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 068
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 068
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Koppelman A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 5-01-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for unlawful delivery of alcohol to certain persons.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Koppelman A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 5-01-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the penalty for unlawful delivery of alcohol to certain persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 068 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-03-17 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2439.html |