ND SB2436 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 038
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 038
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-11.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to polling places for elections held by mail ballot.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-11.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to polling places for elections held by mail ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 038 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-12 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2436.html |