ND SB2424 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 031
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 031
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide funding for water project features constructed to control aquatic nuisance species.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide funding for water project features constructed to control aquatic nuisance species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 015 nays 031 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2424.html |