ND SB2395 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 004 nays 042
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 004 nays 042
Summary
Introduced by Rep. D. Johnson, Pinkerton, Ruby A BILL for an Act to require a study by the state board of veterinary medical examiners regarding afterhours emergency care.
Title
Introduced by Rep. D. Johnson, Pinkerton, Ruby A BILL for an Act to require a study by the state board of veterinary medical examiners regarding afterhours emergency care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 004 nays 042 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 03:15 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2395.html |