ND SB2369 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 16.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political party organization; to amend and reenact sections 16.1-03-01, 16.1-03-02, 16.1-03-03, 16.1-03-05, 16.1-03-07, 16.1-03-08, 16.1-03-11, 16.1-03-14, 16.1-03-17, 16.1-04-01, 16.1-06-04, 16.1-11-22, 16.1-11-30, and 16.1-12-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political party organization, voting precincts, and primary election ballot access; and to repeal sections 16.1-03-12 and 16.1-03-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political party organization.
Title
Political party organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/02 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | New conference committee appointed Kasper Boehning Amerman |
2013-04-22 | Senate | New conference committee appointed Schaible Dever Nelson |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report rejected |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Poolman to replace Sen. Nelson on conference committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Kasper Boehning Zaiser |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Schaible Dever Nelson |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 8 |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |