ND SB2364 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 025
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 025
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Griffin, Gruchalla, Uglem A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of emergency services for providing grants for eligible school districts that have experienced damage or destruction due to a tornado; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Griffin, Gruchalla, Uglem A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of emergency services for providing grants for eligible school districts that have experienced damage or destruction due to a tornado; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 025 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 003 n 002 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2364.html |