ND SB2362 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 57-38-01.26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to extending the time for remitting funds to an angel fund to qualify for an income tax credit for the taxable year; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Extending the time for remitting funds to an angel fund to qualify for an income tax credit for the taxable year; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 9 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 36 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |