ND SB2346 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 003 nays 043
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 003 nays 043
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Conrad, Froelich A BILL for an Act to provide for studies of the implementation of Indian treaty rights relating to education, health, and welfare.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Conrad, Froelich A BILL for an Act to provide for studies of the implementation of Indian treaty rights relating to education, health, and welfare.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-17 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 003 nays 043 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2346.html |