ND SB2344 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 19-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana; to amend and reenact section 54-60-03, paragraph 3 of subdivision a of subsection 15 of section 57-02-08, and paragraph 2 of subdivision b of subsection 15 of section 57-02-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to primary sector business certification and property tax exemptions for farm buildings and residences; to repeal chapter 19-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide for a report; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-04 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 79 nays 13 |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 5 1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |