ND SB2343 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact four new sections to chapter 16.1-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign disclosure statements and use of campaign contributions; to amend and reenact sections 16.1-08.1-01, 16.1-08.1-02.1, 16.1-08.1-03.1, 16.1-08.1-03.2, 16.1-08.1-03.3, and 16.1-08.1-03.5, subsection 3 of section 16.1-08.1-05, and subsection 5 of section 16.1-12-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions and campaign disclosure statements; to repeal sections 16.1-08.1-02, 16.1-08.1-03, 16.1-08.1-03.8, 16.1-08.1-03.9, 16.1-08.1-03.10, 16.1-08.1-03.11, 16.1-08.1-03.12, 16.1-08.1-03.13, and 16.1-08.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign disclosure statements; to provide a penalty; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Campaign disclosure statements; to provide a penalty; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Al Carlson [R] |
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 75 nays 16 |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |