ND SB2342 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to settlements of civil penalties.
Title
Settlements of civil penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Axness [D] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
Rep. Kenton Onstad [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 30 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |