ND SB2341 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the state historical society for archeological surveys.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for an appropriation to the state historical society for archeological surveys.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. John Andrist [R] | Sen. Constance Triplett [D] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] |
Rep. Kenton Onstad [D] | Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 31 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |