ND SB2340 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 14-15-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of parental rights.
Title
Termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 62 nays 31 |
2021-03-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 0 5 |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-23 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |