ND SB2330 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 016 nays 029
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 016 nays 029
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Wrangham A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 26.1-25.1-02 and 26.1-25.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of credit information to take adverse actions against consumers' personal insurance; to repeal sections 26.1-25.1-04, 26.1-25.1-05, 26.1-25.1-06, 26.1-25.1-07, 26.1-25.1-09, 26.1-25.1-10, and 26.1-25.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of credit information to take adverse actions against consumers' personal insurance; and to provide for application.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Wrangham A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 26.1-25.1-02 and 26.1-25.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of credit information to take adverse actions against consumers' personal insurance; to repeal sections 26.1-25.1-04, 26.1-25.1-05, 26.1-25.1-06, 26.1-25.1-07, 26.1-25.1-09, 26.1-25.1-10, and 26.1-25.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of credit information to take adverse actions against consumers' personal insurance; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-06 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 016 nays 029 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 001 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2330.html |