ND SB2328 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-51.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a credit for oil produced from a well site using an onsite flare mitigation system; to provide for application; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A credit for oil produced from a well site using an onsite flare mitigation system; to provide for application; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2021-03-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |