ND SB2327 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of emergency services for fire training.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the department of emergency services for fire training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41 |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba2327.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0821-01000.pdf |