ND SB2325 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Signed by Governor 05/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38, two new subsections to section 57-38-34, a new subsection to section 57-38-38, and a new subsection to section 57-38-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to corporate and individual income tax credits and transition of financial institutions to corporate income tax treatment; to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Elimination of the financial institutions tax; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Wesley Belter [R] |
Rep. Scot Kelsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/06 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-05-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-05-03 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Klein Dockter Strinden |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard Miller Dotzenrod |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |