ND SB2321 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-27-35.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payments to school districts.
Title
Payments to school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 6 |
2017-04-14 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Heinert Guggisberg |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rust Vedaa Schaible |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2017-03-16 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 7 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |