ND SB2321 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study relating to the feasibility and desirability of extending tax relief for assistance to mobilized soldiers.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study relating to the feasibility and desirability of extending tax relief for assistance to mobilized soldiers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 67 | |
2011-03-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-02-10 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-31 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |