ND SB2316 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 18-01-06, 18-01-33, 18-04-01, 18-12-03, 18-12-05, and 18-12-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to powers and duties of the state fire marshal regarding explosives, participation in the fire insurance tax distribution fund, and the submission of plans and specifications for school buildings; to repeal sections 18-01-34 and 18-10-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disclosure of information concerning toxic or hazardous substances and the duty of the state fire marshal to establish a rural routing system; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Disclosure of information concerning toxic or hazardous substances and the duty of the state fire marshal to establish a rural routing system; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2017-04-06 | House | Conference committee appointed Rich S. Becker Longmuir Simons |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Burckhard Kannianen Dotzenrod |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 4 |
2017-03-23 | House | Rereferred to Political Subdivisions |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 2 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |