ND SB2301 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 19-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to specialty pharmacy services; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Title
Specialty pharmacy services; to provide a penalty; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9 |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |