ND SB2297 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for capital projects of various state departments and institutions; to authorize the industrial commission to issue and sell evidences of indebtedness for capital projects; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for capital projects of various state departments and institutions; to authorize the industrial commission to issue and sell evidences of indebtedness for capital projects; to provide an exemption; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] |
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/01 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-26 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 74 nays 17 |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Vigesaa Sanford Boe |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sorvaag Holmberg Robinson |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-15 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 68 nays 20 |
2019-04-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 3 3 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |