ND SB2291 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-03.1, a new subsection to section 30.1-28-04, and a new subsection to section 30.1-28-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to powers, duties, and authority of a guardian regarding medical decisions; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Powers, duties, and authority of a guardian regarding medical decisions; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 92 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |