ND SB2283 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Signed by Governor 04/03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to denial of tax incentives to taxpayers delinquent on the payment of state or local taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Denial of tax incentives to taxpayers delinquent on the payment of state or local taxes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/03 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |