ND SB2282 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 28-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the limitation on claims for sexual assault; and to amend and reenact sections 28-01-18, 28-01-22.1, 28-01-25.1, and 32-12.1-10, and subsection 1 of section 32-12.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on civil actions alleging sexual assault, sexual abuse, gross sexual imposition, or childhood sexual abuse, and the notice requirement for claims against the state.
Title
Limitations on civil actions alleging sexual assault, sexual abuse, gross sexual imposition, or childhood sexual abuse, and the notice requirement for claims against the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Judy Estenson [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. Claire Cory [R] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 33 |
2023-04-05 | House | Amendment failed, placed on calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 4 2 |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |