ND SB2272 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 15-10-38.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to administrative fees retained by the state board of higher education; to amend and reenact sections 15-10-38.1 and 15-10-38.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the skilled workforce student loan repayment program and skilled workforce scholarship program; to amend and reenact section 15-10-38.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to scholarship and loan forgiveness administrative costs; to repeal sections 15-10-38.1 and 15-10-38.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the skilled workforce student loan repayment program and the skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The skilled workforce student loan repayment program and the skilled workforce scholarship program; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 60 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-20 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-20 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22 |
2021-04-20 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens Monson Zubke |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Schaible Lemm Conley |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-04-09 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2021-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 29 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |