ND SB2267 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 27-02.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the number of attorneys that may participate in the rural attorney recruit program.
Title
The number of attorneys that may participate in the rural attorney recruit program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 6 |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 0 4 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 5 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:05 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 7 0 0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |