ND SB2266 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 12.1-27.2-01, 12.1-27.2-02, 12.1-27.2-03, 12.1-27.2-04, and 12.1-27.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of minors in sexual performances; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The use of minors in sexual performances; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Concurred |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |