ND SB2266 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 10-06.1-17 and 10-15-05, subsection
Title
Cooperative association of articles of incorporation and address of the principal office, business corporation definitions, articles of incorporation, amendment of articles of incorporation, involuntary dissolution, limited liability company articles of organization and amendment of the articles of organization, nonprofit corporation articles of incorporation and amendment of articles of incorporation, and contents of the registration a real estate investment trust.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. John Andrist [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] |
Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Rep. Eliot Glassheim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Concurred |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |