ND SB2266 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assessment of booking fees by correctional facilities.
Title
The assessment of booking fees by correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Gruchalla [D] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Sen. Constance Triplett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45 | |
2011-02-15 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 0 1 | |
2011-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba2266.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0701-01000.pdf |