ND SB2262 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Annual reports of certain political subdivisions in
Sponsors
Sen. David O'Connell [D] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] |
Rep. Bob Hunskor [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2015-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |