ND SB2256 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 10 of section 65-01-02 and paragraph 10 of subdivision b of subsection 10 of section 65-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation coverage of first responders for posttraumatic stress disorder; to provide for application; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Workers' compensation coverage of first responders for posttraumatic stress disorder; to provide for application; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2015-03-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 55 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 3 |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |