ND SB2248 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-07.1 and subsection 51 of section 20.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonresident waterfowl hunting.
Title
Nonresident waterfowl hunting.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Rep. Curt Hofstad [R] |
Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 23 |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba2248.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0751-01000.pdf |