ND SB2243 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of teacher loan forgiveness programs.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of teacher loan forgiveness programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Owens M. Ruby Mock |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Schaible Rust Oban |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 14 |
2017-03-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |