ND SB2241 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of department of commerce satellite offices on Indian reservations.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of department of commerce satellite offices on Indian reservations.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Sen. John Warner [D] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
Rep. Kenton Onstad [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 63 |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 1 |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |