ND SB2235 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 43 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the interstate medical licensure compact.
Title
The interstate medical licensure compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 74 |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |