ND SB2234 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 19-24.1-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the growing of medical marijuana; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-01 and section 19-24.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allowable amounts of usable medical marijuana and protections for growing medical marijuana.
Title
Allowable amounts of usable medical marijuana and protections for growing medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 42 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |