ND SB2232 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 29-04-02.1 and 29-04-03.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statute of limitations for the crime of human trafficking.
Title
The statute of limitations for the crime of human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Rep. Gail Mooney [D] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |