ND SB2230 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of hybrid long-term care partnership plan insurance coverage.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of hybrid long-term care partnership plan insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 10 |
2017-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |