ND SB2227 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-16-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the members of the emergency commission.
Title
The members of the emergency commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |