ND SB2224 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 4.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a bioscience innovation grant program; to amend and reenact sections 54-65-01, 54-65-06, and 54-65-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to research North Dakota; to repeal section 10-30.5-14, chapters 15-69 and 54-65, and sections 54-65-02, 54-65-03, 54-65-04, and 54-65-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the centers of excellence, centers of research excellence, and research North Dakota; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The centers of excellence, centers of research excellence, and research North Dakota; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide an appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/25 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-04-19 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 78 nays 14 |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 0 4 |
2019-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass 13 1 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |