ND SB2222 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 30.1-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency conservators; to amend and reenact section 30.1-03-02, subsection 1 of section 30.1-29-05, sections 30.1-29-07 and 30.1-29-08, subsection 1 of section 30.1-29-09, and sections 30.1-29-18, 30.1-29-19, 30.1-29-22, 30.1-29-24, and 30.1-29-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a conservatorship.
Title
A conservatorship.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Jonathan Sickler [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 1 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |