ND SB2219 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 067
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 067
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Kilichowski, Kingsbury, Thoreson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 27-01-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees assessed for criminal violations; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Kilichowski, Kingsbury, Thoreson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 27-01-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees assessed for criminal violations; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 018 nays 067 | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 008 n 005 | |
2009-03-11 | Rereferred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 003 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-01-30 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2219.html |