ND SB2216 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 12.1-17-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a health care facility; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 12.1-17-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contact by bodily fluids or excrement; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Contact by bodily fluids or excrement; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Greg Westlind [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 16 |
2017-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Armstrong to replace Sen. D. Larson on conference committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House recede) |
2017-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Karls Roers Jones M. Nelson |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Myrdal Luick D. Larson |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 1 0 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |