ND SB2215 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-16-06 and 15.1-16-10, subsection 1 of section 15.1-16-11, section 15.1-16-13, subsection 1 of section 15.1-16-14, and sections 15.1-16-15 and 15.1-16-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to deadlines for teacher negotiations between school districts and representative organizations.
Title
Deadlines for teacher negotiations between school districts and representative organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Kyle Davison [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29 |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |